Financial history MOUSEHOLE COMMUNITY CHILDCARE ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1089724
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2015 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019
Total gross income £51.17k £48.27k £39.26k £37.98k £55.12k
Total expenditure £42.65k £43.84k £48.01k £43.40k £42.16k
Income from government contracts £39.86k £38.26k £32.62k £0 N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £28.60k £45.12k