Trustees THE WESTENDERS
Charity number: 1082950

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIKE DAVID CHARLES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Timothy Ross Short | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robin Thompson | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Roger Smith | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joan Manley | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brydie Alexandra Jones | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul James Ashton | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Diana Gail Altmeyer | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kristina Fiona Barker | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN GLENN BRADSHAW | Trustee | 21 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PAUL BOWEN | Trustee | 23 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Paul Dean Cole | Trustee | 28 May 2010 |
|
|
||||
JULIE HELEN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA MARGARET JANE WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN NEWMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHELLE DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.