Accounts and annual returns ROSARY PILGRIMAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1080340
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2008 26 February 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 26 February 2009 On Time
Annual return 30 April 2007 27 February 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2007 27 February 2008 On Time
Annual return 30 April 2006 21 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2006 21 February 2007 On Time
Annual return 30 April 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Annual return 30 April 2004 16 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2004 16 December 2004 On Time