Financial history BOLEY PARK PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1081087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £56.37k £48.40k £57.30k £65.23k £78.14k
Total expenditure £56.02k £49.34k £54.20k £59.82k £70.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £3.55k £2.45k N/A N/A