Accounts and annual returns YOUTHWORX - EAST AFRICA

Charity number: 1081113
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2019 17 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 14 March 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 12 May 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 12 May 2018 On Time