Accounts and annual returns NELSON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1082767
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2022 16 August 2024 413 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 16 August 2024 413 days late
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 July 2024 757 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 26 July 2024 757 days late
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 05 May 2020 On Time