Financial history CWM COMMUNITY ACTION GROUP

Charity number: 1080539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £29.13k £156.86k £8.75k £14.51k £9.54k
Total expenditure £8.51k £30.80k £10.49k £24.66k £27.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £300 £11.25k N/A £3.96k N/A