Governing document DERBYSHIRE TOY LIBRARIES (DTL)
Charity number: 1081255

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/03/2000 AS AMENDED ON 17/05/2000 AS AMENDED ON 14/07/2000 AS AMENDED ON 21/09/2001 AS AMENDED ON 09/09/2002 AS AMENDED ON 10/02/2003 AS AMENDED ON 30/03/2014 as amended on 15 Feb 2023 as amended on 04 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
For the public benefit and education of all local children and the general public, by the provision of educational and stimulating toys and resources.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.