Accounts and annual returns NEWARK AND DISTRICT MUSIC CLUB

Charity number: 1082099
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2017 10 February 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 25 February 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2015 23 February 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2015 Not Required