Accounts and annual returns UK COALITION OF PEOPLE LIVING WITH HIV AND AIDS

Charity number: 1081309
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 30 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 23 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 03 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 04 October 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 31 August 2005 212 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 27 September 2004 On Time