Financial history BICKLEIGH SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1083196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £6.91k £2.70k £13.99k £5.04k £7.83k
Total expenditure £4.98k £3.23k £10.26k £5.40k £9.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A