Accounts and annual returns PILGRIM HEARTS TRUST

Charity number: 1085766
Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window