Accounts and annual returns AXMINSTER TASK CENTRE

Charity number: 1080973
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 February 2017 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 13 February 2017 13 days late
Annual return 31 March 2015 03 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 19 February 2017 385 days late
Annual return 31 March 2014 19 February 2015 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 19 February 2015 19 days late