Financial history QUEST FOR LIFE

Charity number: 1083156
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £20.75k £11.20k £6.54k £4.44k £2.00k
Total expenditure £55.04k £42.04k £40.54k £30.04k £25.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A