Financial history NACTON SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1082795
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £3.96k £2.52k £2.83k £2.41k £5.27k
Total expenditure £4.08k £3.44k £2.32k £2.02k £4.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A