Accounts and annual returns DISPLACED PEOPLE IN ACTION

Charity number: 1082176
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2007 29 August 2008 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2007 03 September 2008 95 days late
Annual return 31 December 2006 17 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 06 September 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 12 July 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 12 July 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 14 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 14 September 2005 On Time