Accounts and annual returns COMPUTERS FOR AFRICAN SCHOOLS

Charity number: 1081900
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2011 02 May 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 24 February 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 24 February 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2009 26 February 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 26 February 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2008 15 April 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 15 April 2009 On Time