Accounts and annual returns GUILDFORD ARTS

Charity number: 1089777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 September 2024 224 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required