Governing document ROSPA ADVANCED DRIVERS AND RIDERS-MANCHESTER
Charity number: 1083564

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 MAR 1984 AS AMENDED ON 14 MAR 1989 AS AMENDED ON 15 MAR 1994 AS AMENDED ON 11 MAR 1997 AS AMENDED ON 14 MAR 2000 AS AMENDED ON 31 OCT 2000 AS AMENDED ON 13 MAR 2001 AS AMENDED ON 12 MAR 2002 AS AMENDED ON 16 MAR 2006 AS AMENDED ON 09 MAR 2010 AS AMENDED ON 08 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE GROUP ARE FOR THE PUBLIC TO PROMOTE THE IMPROVEMENT OF STANDARD OF DRIVING AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF ROAD SAFETY IN THE MANCHESTER AREA.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
MANCHESTER AREA
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.