Trustees THE COMMUNITY CENTRE @ STUDLEY GREEN
Charity Number: 1089525

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Colin Gillott | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Edward David Paul Bayly | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Wilkins | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ann Willcock | Trustee | 18 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA MARGARET McTAVISH | Trustee | 12 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY NORTH | Trustee | 12 October 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.