Financial history MURSLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1081306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £103.85k £1.43k £880 £199 £60
Total expenditure £103.42k £1.53k £323 £563 £241
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A