Accounts and annual returns BUCKFASTLEIGH YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 1085584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 December 2023 07 November 2024 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 December 2022 07 November 2024 374 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 December 2021 07 November 2024 739 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 December 2020 31 March 2022 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 December 2019 31 March 2022 517 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2019 Not Required