Accounts and annual returns NEOC

Charity number: 1084315
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2010 28 April 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 28 April 2011 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2009 09 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 09 July 2010 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2008 22 July 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 22 July 2009 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2007 28 July 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 28 July 2008 On Time