Financial history Farthinghoe School Ties

Charity number: 1085971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £2.70k £332 £1.74k £1.24k £2.95k
Total expenditure £1.62k £1.30k £1.45k £1.77k £2.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A