Financial history FRIENDS OF BUCKFASTLEIGH SCHOOL

Charity number: 1083826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 11/11/2019 11/11/2020 11/11/2021 01/11/2022 01/11/2023
Total gross income £11.56k £1.14k £1.21k £3.44k £4.71k
Total expenditure £4.85k £1.59k £2.75k £1.09k £6.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A