Financial history HOUSE OF HOPE NEPAL

Charity Number: 1083224
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2010 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014
Total gross income £5.13k £6.92k £13.32k £6.25k £3.65k
Total expenditure £4.24k £575 £10.94k £3.86k £13.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A