Accounts and annual returns RAP-AID

Charity number: 1085964
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2009 30 August 2010 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2009 30 August 2010 91 days late
Annual return 31 July 2008 09 February 2011 619 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 30 August 2010 456 days late