Accounts and annual returns CHRIST TRIUMPHANT INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1085714
Charity reporting is overdue by 228 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 26 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 228 days
Accounts and TAR 26 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 228 days
Annual return 26 November 2022 26 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 26 November 2021 31 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 26 November 2020 31 March 2022 186 days late
Accounts and TAR 26 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 26 November 2019 06 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 November 2019 Not Required