Financial history CLITHEROE U3A THIRD AGE TRUST

Charity number: 1082254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.68k £7.60k £5.75k £13.19k £16.33k
Total expenditure £16.62k £6.71k £8.70k £14.81k £15.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A