Accounts and annual returns CADW I FYND

Charity number: 1089346
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2006 29 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2006 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2005 15 February 2006 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2005 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2004 30 September 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2004 Not Required