Financial history SCUNTHORPE BERKELEY LODGE (E) TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD

Charity number: 1082396
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2007 31/01/2008 31/01/2013 31/01/2014 31/01/2015
Total gross income £6.29k £5.05k £4.23k £3.26k £4.12k
Total expenditure £5.71k £5.20k £4.41k £3.31k £4.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A