Trustees NORTH HARROW TOWNSWOMEN GUILD
Charity number: 1082502

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemary Clifford | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Rogerson | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Turner | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Anne Wood | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE HARROWELL | Trustee | 09 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Jenkins | Trustee | 10 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
June Sultan | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kathy Simpson | Trustee | 14 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
IRENE TROTT | Trustee | 30 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
JACKIE TURNPENNEY | Trustee | 30 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET SPANNER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.