Financial history THE SHAANI TRUST

Charity Number: 1082869
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 25/08/2009 25/08/2010 25/08/2011 25/08/2012 25/08/2013
Total gross income £158 £120 £80 £0 £0
Total expenditure £400 £100 £50 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A