Accounts and annual returns OPPORTUNITIES THROUGH TECHNOLOGY

Charity number: 1083125
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2011 05 July 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2011 05 July 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2010 15 August 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2010 11 July 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2009 10 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2009 18 May 2010 On Time