Financial history KING'S LYNN TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD

Charity number: 1082924
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2007 31/01/2008 31/01/2009 31/01/2010 31/01/2011
Total gross income £1.84k £1.28k £1.20k £1.08k £984
Total expenditure £1.96k £1.35k £1.17k £1.23k £972
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A