Financial history YOUNG ENGINEERS

Charity number: 1084134
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2012 30/09/2013 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 30/09/2016
Total gross income £295.61k £265.40k £342.75k £395.07k £290.08k
Total expenditure £294.14k £314.89k £348.04k £337.53k £328.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0