Accounts and annual returns THE NORTH AND SOUTH MANCHESTER COUNSELLING SERVICE

Charity number: 1086389
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2007 29 February 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2006 28 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2006 Not Required