Accounts and annual returns AGE CONCERN DUDLEY

Charity Number: 1084182
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2020 27 May 2022 392 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 27 May 2022 392 days late