Financial history THE RAKITOVO SELF-SUFFICIENCY FUND

Charity number: 1083429
Charity reporting is up to date (27 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £22.87k £20.22k £19.34k £16.67k £15.35k
Total expenditure £23.40k £25.74k £19.22k £19.83k £20.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A