Accounts and annual returns THE PENARTH GYMNASTIC CLUB

Charity number: 1083383
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not submitted