Accounts and annual returns COMMUNITY ACTION WYRE FOREST

Charity number: 1083587
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 June 2024 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window