Accounts and annual returns SUTTON-AT-HONE C.E. PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1085024
Charity reporting is up to date (61 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 31 July 2024 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 27 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 27 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 07 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 08 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 17 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required