Accounts and annual returns TEMPLE BABA BALAK NATH JI EK HAI MALAK

Charity number: 1097065
Charity reporting is up to date (46 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 March 2025 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 18 March 2025 46 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 August 2024 206 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 24 August 2024 206 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 March 2023 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 24 March 2023 52 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 March 2022 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 March 2022 59 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 February 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 February 2021 17 days late Download Open in new window