Financial history PRIMARY CARE CARDIOVASCULAR SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1089600
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010
Total gross income £199.56k £173.36k £323.75k £575.73k £382.73k
Total expenditure £161.05k £216.93k £307.44k £545.27k £523.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £575.73k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £530.10k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £15.18k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A