Accounts and annual returns BEBINGTON CENTRE FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE (BCVS)

Charity number: 1092330
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 12 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 13 November 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 28 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 11 December 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 18 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 21 December 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 08 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 08 November 2005 On Time