Financial history KINGSLAND COLLEGE OF BUSINESS STUDIES

Charity Number: 1086767
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010 31/08/2011 31/08/2012
Total gross income £68.65k £15.01k £20.13k £0 £612
Total expenditure £68.54k £43.85k £46.50k £2.89k £890
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A