Financial history SENIOR PEOPLE'S FORUM OF WARWICK DISTRICT

Charity number: 1088476
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2008 31/05/2009 31/05/2010 31/05/2011 31/05/2012
Total gross income £9.49k £7.53k £7.63k £5.42k £6.11k
Total expenditure £11.83k £3.44k £8.84k £2.25k £1.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A