Accounts and annual returns KURDISH COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1083004
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 December 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 December 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 February 2018 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 February 2018 2 days late
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 June 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 13 June 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 03 December 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 03 December 2015 On Time