Accounts and annual returns HEBRON EVANGELICAL CHURCH WALLASEY TRUST

Charity Number: 1086893
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 26 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 26 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 10 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 10 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 29 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 29 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 17 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 17 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 06 September 2020 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 06 September 2020 6 days late Download Open in new window