Accounts and annual returns SEAHAM PARKSIDE (E) TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD

Charity Number: 1083307
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2006 15 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2005 13 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2004 20 August 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2004 Not Required